Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with DEBRA J. YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA J. YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management43 days |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-TRANSFER TO APPELLATE YOUNG (Court Activity) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
November 30, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
November 27, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
October 16, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE YOUNG (Prelim. Conference) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
October 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) CHOLAKIS (Motion Part) Judge: CATHERINE CHOLAKIS |
|
September 03, 2020 | Motion |
Reverse Decision (Motion #001) Decided: 11/30/2020TRANSFERRED TO THE APPELLATE D Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CHOLAKIS (Motion Part) Judge: CATHERINE CHOLAKIS |
|
September 03, 2020 | Motion |
Reverse Decision (Motion #001) Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.