Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL H. MELKONIAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2019 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT MELKONIAN (Court Activity) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
August 13, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
July 29, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
July 23, 2019 | Motion |
Divorce (Motion #001) Decided: 08/13/2019GRANTED Before Justice: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN Answer demanded: No Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
July 23, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
July 23, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MELKONIAN (Court Activity) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
July 22, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MELKONIAN (Court Activity) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.