Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with DEBRA J. YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA J. YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2019 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time109 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED YOUNG (Court Activity) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
June 07, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
April 08, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
April 08, 2019 | Motion |
Annul Determination (Adj From (Motion #001) Decided: 07/26/2019DENIED - DIRECTS AG/RES TO MAI Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.