Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Peagler, Tia B, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J. Hara Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions274 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Granted Party Only | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Supplemental Summons and Complaint Filed | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.