Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lanzarotto, Sheryl, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Green, Rashelle Roseanne, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2005 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Contested | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff | |
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.