Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fresno Credit Bureau, Kilgore, Connie Elaine, filed a(n) Fraud: Unlimited case against Pacific West Coast Mortgage In, Denison, Dedrick George, Jr, Denison, Kristina, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
CategoryFraud: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.