Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case against Martha Alejandro Sandovalramirez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Maria - Miller - Traffic with No Assigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNo Assigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 03, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Maria - Miller - Traffic |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2009 | Action | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
June 22, 2009 | Action | Trial By Declaration: Decision (TR-215), Filed | |
June 09, 2009 | Action | Trial By Declaration: Request for TBD (TR-205), Filed | |
May 06, 2009 | Action | Trial By Declaration: Officer Instructions (TR-210), Filed | |
May 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Arraignment
Judge: Steven D Belasco |
|
April 07, 2009 | Action | Courtesy Notice, Mailed | |
April 07, 2009 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
April 07, 2009 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
April 07, 2009 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
April 07, 2009 | Action | Clerk's Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.