Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Serna Michael, Serna Veronica, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Bardacke Francheska M., Marshall Erin M, Wallin Dennis K., against Hall, C.N.P. Rashonda, Lynn Christopher, San Miguel Hospital Corp., Sordo Salvador Md, Spady Steven Do, (total of 7) See All represented by Hall Jennifer Davis, Kenny Rebecca Shaw, Kuhlmann Megan L., Larkin Laureana Alicia, Marshall Jessica D., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Aragon, Abigail presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAragon, Abigail Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Aragon, Abigail |
|
October 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Aragon, Abigail |
|
August 10, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Aragon, Abigail |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPLY Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Alternative Service on Defendant Christopher Lynn, CRNA Pursuant to 1-004(J) NMRA |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: COMPLETION OF BRIEFING Notice of Completion of Briefing; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Alternative Service |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Return; Christopher Lynn was served with Summons and Complaint via certified mail on 8/3/23 | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; San Miguel Hospital Corporation d/b/a Alta Vista Regional Hospital s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Michael and Veronica Serna were electronically mailed on 7/26/23 to counsel of record | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORD: OF CONTINUANCE Order Continuing Hearing |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Defendant Christopher Lynn, CRNA s Response In Opposition to Plaintiff s Motion for Alternative Service |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: FOR CONTINUANCE Motion to Continue Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.