Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Masters Mark T filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Gallegos, Flora presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallegos, Flora Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecision For The Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NCJ: AMENDED JUDGMENT/ORDER Amended Final Order Changing Name; Now Known As Aeon Tomas Elvin Lachlann Campbell Masters |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: ORDER CHANGING NAME Final Order Changing Name |
|
July 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Name Change Hearing
Judge: Gallegos, Flora |
|
July 11, 2022 | Hearing |
NAME CHANGE HEARING
Judge: Gallegos, Flora |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONSENT Father's Consent to Name Change |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING Notice of Petition for Change of Name; Hearing on 07/11/2022 at 11:00 AM |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Free Process and Affidavit of Indigency | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Request for Setting; Name Change |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
OPN: PETITION Petition for Change of Name; Child Name Change |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.