Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vigil John Paul, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Elion Gary D., Romero Joe M., against Agua Pura Mutual Domestic Consumer Water Assoc., The Board Of County Commissioners Of The County Of Mora, represented by Quinones Carlos M., in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Shannon, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShannon, Jeffrey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Intervenor's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Discovery Requests were served on 7/31/23 to counsel | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORD: STIPULATED Stipulated Confidentiality Order |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF NON-AVAILABILITY Notice of Non-Availability; Joe M. Romero, Jr. |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
AUDIO LOG NOTES Log Notes Filed; Scheduling Conference held on March 27, 2023 at 1:02:43 pm to 1:16:59 pm; Laurie Duran-Robles monitor; CD received |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Mora County's First Request for Entry on Designated Land or Property, along with Certificate was emailed to counsel of record on 07-13-23 | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Notice to Take Deposition of Brad Sena |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Plaintiff John Paul Vigil |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production were emailed to Nathaniel Thompkins on 06-16-23 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Mora County's Answers, Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission were electronically mailed on 6/9/23 to counsel of record | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Amended Notice to take Deposition of Plaintiff John Paul Vigil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.