Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Royal Christy Jeanette, filed a(n) case against Ross Oil Company, Ross Kenneth, Montano Stacy Lee, represented by Bundrant Lindsey A., in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Aragon, Abigail presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAragon, Abigail Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Notice of Taking Deposition; Christy Jeanette Roybal |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendant Ross Oil's First Interrogatories, Request for Production and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff were sent by eletronic email on 12/29/21 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORD: RULE 16B SCHEDULING/FORM Rule 16(B) Scheduling Order (JURY) |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORD: STIPULATED Stipulated Order Vacating May Trial and Setting Matter on October 4-7, 2022 Docket |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO VACATE Unopposed Motion to Vacate May Trial and Set Matter on October 4-7, 2022 Docket |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
AUDIO LOG NOTES Log Notes; Hearing held on 12/02/2021 at 11:03am-11:08am; Hearing held in Courtroom 2 (MDR) |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING Request for Presentment Hearing; Motion to Dismiss Philadelphia Insurance Company |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NCJ: DISMISSAL BY PARTY Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Dismissal of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company with Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.