Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maes Doris, Maes Theodore, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Jaffe Mark Steven, against Alcon Tracy, Board Of Education Of The Mora Independent School District, Castillo Lefonso, Lazaro Garcia Middle School, Macauley Marvin, (total of 5) See All represented by Coppler Gerald A., in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Aragon, Abigail presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAragon, Abigail Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition of Amos Espinoza |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff Theodore Maes, Sent Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Admission to Defendant Board of Education on July 28, 2023 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production of Documents were electronically mailed on 5/31/23 to counsel of record | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff Theodore Maes Second Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Board of education of the Mora Independent School District was sent on 5/2/23 | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED Subpoena Return; Subpoena was served on 4/6/23 |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED/MODIFIED Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Marvin MacAuley (Audio and Video Recorded) |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED/MODIFIED Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Lefonso Castillo (Audio and Video Recorded) |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED Subpoena Duces Tecum Return; Mora County Sheriff's Office was served with Subpoena on 2/2/23 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
JDG: SUPREME COURT ORDER DESIGNATING JUDGE Order; Judge Francis J. Mathew designated by Supreme Court Order |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Clerk's Certificate; District Court Pleadings sent to the Supreme Court for designation of judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.