Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Daniels Arlene, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Alsup Gary, Mathis Eugenio S., against May Industries Limited Co., May Joseph A. Iii, May Molly Anne, represented by Bell Jay Bryan, Perkal Ross B., in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Gallegos, Flora presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallegos, Flora Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecision Mixed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: FINAL DECREE/ORDER/JUDGMENT Stipulated Final Decree |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Notice of Settlement Agreement |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Plaintiff's List of Witnesses |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORD: RULE 16B SCHEDULING/FORM Rule 1-016 NMRA Pre- Trial Schedule Order (non-jury) |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendant Joseph A. May III Answers to Plaintiff Arlene Daniel's First Set of Request for Admissions was sent via e-mail on 12/16/21 | |
December 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Gallegos, Flora |
|
December 14, 2021 | Hearing |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Judge: Gallegos, Flora |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) Notice of Scheduling Conference |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE/ PROOF OF MAILING Certificate of Mailing; Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and Requests for Production were electronically served on 11/16/21 to Defendant's counsel |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF NON-AVAILABILITY Notice of Non-Availability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.