Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Ohlfs Richard Q., Mitchell Jonathan Ray, against Gutierrez Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Gallegos, Flora presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallegos, Flora Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal For Lack Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: DISMISSAL BY LACK OF PROSECUTION Disposition Order for Lack of Prosecution |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
JDG: NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Notice of Judge Reassignment; Judge Flora Gallegos is now Assigned |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
JDG: JUDGE RECUSAL Order of Recusal; Judge Michael Aragon |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff mailed a copy of Motion for Default Judgment to Defendant on 11/11/2021 via US mail | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY Affidavit Under the Soldier's and Sailors' Relief Act |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION/APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Motion for Default Judgment |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE AS TO THE STATE OF THE RECORD Clerk Issued Certificate as to the State of the Record |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Return; Clifford Gutierrez was served with Summons and Complaint on 8/27/21 | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
OPN: COMPLAINT Complaint for Money Due |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.