Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Romero Epifania, filed a(n) case represented by Aragon Anna M., against Martinez Alvin, in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Aragon, Abigail presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAragon, Abigail Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecision For The Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLS: STIPULATED ORDER Stipulated Order |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Audio Log Notes; Hearing held 9/2/2021 at 1:42 p.m. to 1:46 p.m.; Hearing held at Mora Magistrate(ehm) | |
September 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Aragon, Abigail |
|
September 02, 2021 | Hearing |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Judge: Aragon, Abigail |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) Notice of Scheduling Conference |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Return; Complaint and Summons served to Alvin Martinez on 06-02-21 | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
OPN: PETITION Petition for Restoration of Separate Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.