Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Roybal C. Nathaniel Md, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Roybal-Mack Antonia, against Family Dollar Stores Of New Mexico, Inc., represented by Gonzales Steven Lee, in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Aragon, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAragon, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecision Mixed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLS: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Order of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
March 27, 2023 | Hearing |
BENCH TRIAL
Judge: Aragon, Michael A. |
|
February 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Pretrial Hearing
Judge: Aragon, Michael A. |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (STATUS) Notice of Status Conference |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORD: VACATING HEARING Stipulated Order to Vacate NMRA Rule 16 Scheduling Order and Trial Setting |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO VACATE Joint Motion to Vacate All Hearings and Deadlines |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Defendant's Expert Witness List |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: HEARING (MOTION) Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.