Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vigil Luciano, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Schmidt D. Maria, Woods Jonathan D., Scholl Andrew, against Rural Surgical Associates Of Las Vegas, Llc, Swidinsky Teddi Md, represented by Martin Jeremy Ian, Slattery William P., in the jurisdiction of Mora County, NM, . Mora County, NM Superior Courts with Gallegos, Flora presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallegos, Flora Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMora County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismiss/Decided By Dispositive Motion/Dismiss By Judge/Party |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLS: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Order Granting Stipulated Motion To Dismiss |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS Stipulated Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORD: ORDER GRANTING Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
MTN: TO DISMISS Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claim |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Mario Leyba, M.D. |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Defendants' Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production were electronically served on 5/20/22 to listed counsel | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff's Second Request for Admissions to Defendant Teddi Swidinsky M.D. was served via email on 5/17/22 | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service; Plaintiff's Subpoena for Production of Documents to Alta Vista Regional Hospital was served via e-mail on 5/13/22 | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION 2nd Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum to Priscilla Medina |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NTC: OF DEPOSITION Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum to Priscilla Medina |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.