Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Drive New Jersey Insurance, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elissa Breanne Wolf, against Ace American Insurance Company, Jhon C Fleurival, Werner Enterprises,Inc., in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by WOLF, ELISSA, BREANNE of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY against JHON CLEEF FLEURIVAL, WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 11, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by WOLF, ELISSA, BREANNE of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by WOLF, ELISSA, BREANNE of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY against WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by WOLF, ELISSA, BREANNE of JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY, DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE COMPANY against WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC. | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for WRN-L-000239-22 submitted by WOLF, ELISSA BREANNE, JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, PC on behalf of DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE, DRIVE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE against JHON C FLEURIVAL, WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.