Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ian D O'Connor, Julia C O'Connor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Howard Z. Myerowitz, against Abc Corporations 1-5, Christian B Gutierrez, John Does 1-5, Penske Truck Leasingco., Vell-Mac Foods, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Christopher N Leeds, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RELIEVE COUNSEL-Granted by Judge BALLARD, ROBERT, A re: MOTION TO RELIEVE COUNSEL [LCV20231982480] | |
July 21, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RELIEVE COUNSEL | ||
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/30/2023 will be decided on 07/21/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO RELIEVE COUNSEL [LCV20231982480] | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RELIEVE COUNSEL submitted by MARTIN, JAMES, D of MARTIN KANE KUPER, LLC on behalf of JULIA C O'CONNOR, IAN D O'CONNOR against CHRISTIAN B GUTIERREZ, VELL-MAC FOODS, INC., PENSKE TRUCK LEASINGCO., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by MARTIN, JAMES, D of MARTIN KANE KUPER, LLC on behalf of JULIA C O'CONNOR, IAN D O'CONNOR against CHRISTIAN B GUTIERREZ, VELL-MAC FOODS, INC., PENSKE TRUCK LEASINGCO., JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM-Granted by Judge BALLARD, ROBERT, A re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV2023789551] | |
April 14, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM | ||
March 31, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM | ||
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by SANTANA, SIERRA, S of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of CHRISTIAN B GUTIERREZ, VELL-MAC FOODS, INC., PENSKE TRUCK LEASINGCO. against JULIA C O'CONNOR, IAN D O'CONNOR *LINKED FILING* | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/03/2023 was rescheduled to 04/14/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV2023789551] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.