Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ana Cordero, Jorge Melvin Cordero, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kenneth D Iulo, against 5 Abc Xyz Co. Corp. 1-, John Jane Does 1-5, William Thier, represented by Samuel Patrick Reisen, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 29, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 15, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of JORGE MELVIN CORDERO, ANA CORDERO against WILLIAM THIER | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231575050] -granted. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 12, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT | ||
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of JORGE MELVIN CORDERO, ANA CORDERO against WILLIAM THIER *LINKED FILING* | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 04/24/2023 re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20231324111] | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/20/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20231324111] | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of JORGE MELVIN CORDERO, ANA CORDERO against WILLIAM THIER *LINKED FILING* | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by IULO, KENNETH, D of KENNETH D. IULO on behalf of JORGE MELVIN CORDERO, ANA CORDERO against WILLIAM THIER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.