Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Diane Terraciano, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Thomas Paul Fischer, against Diane Luongo, represented by Vanessa Marie Luaces, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by FISCHER, THOMAS, PAUL of BROSCIOUS, FISCHER & ZAITER on behalf of DIANE TERRACIANO against DIANE LUONGO | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by LUACES, VANESSA, MARIE of LAW OFFICES OF ERIC H BENNETT on behalf of DIANE LUONGO against DIANE TERRACIANO | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE submitted by FISCHER, THOMAS, PAUL of BROSCIOUS, FISCHER & ZAITER on behalf of DIANE TERRACIANO against DIANE LUONGO | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for WRN-L-000179-22 submitted by FISCHER, THOMAS PAUL, BROSCIOUS, FISCHER & ZAITER on behalf of DIANE TERRACIANO against DIANE LUONGO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.