Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Scenic Investment Group, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael Paul O'Grodnick, against Marieelen Betro, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 12, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by O'GRODNICK, MICHAEL, PAUL of SAVO SCHALK CORSINI WARNER GILLESPIE O'GRODNICK FISHER on behalf of SCENIC INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC against MARIEELEN BETRO | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for WRN-L-000160-22 submitted by O'GRODNICK, MICHAEL PAUL, SAVO SCHALK CORSINI WARNER GILLESPIE O'GRODNICK FISHER on behalf of SCENIC INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC against MARIEELEN BETRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.