Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jerome B Nazareno, filed a(n) Whistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) case represented by Kevin Michael Costello, against Barton'S West End Farms, Inc., John Does 1-5, John Does 6-10, represented by Jacqueline Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2022 |
CategoryWhistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by COSTELLO, KEVIN, MICHAEL of COSTELLO & MAINS LLC on behalf of JEROME B NAZARENO against BARTON'S WEST END FARMS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by LEVY, JARED, K of WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN, LLP on behalf of BARTON'S WEST END FARMS, INC. against JEROME B NAZARENO | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge BALLARD, ROBERT, A re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231039274] | |
April 28, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY | ||
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by COSTELLO, KEVIN, MICHAEL of COSTELLO & MAINS LLC on behalf of JEROME B NAZARENO against BARTON'S WEST END FARMS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 *LINKED FILING* | |
April 14, 2023 | MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY | ||
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/27/2023 was rescheduled to 04/28/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231039274] | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MURPHY, JACQUELINE of WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN, LLP on behalf of BARTON'S WEST END FARMS, INC. against JEROME B NAZARENO *LINKED FILING* | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/27/2023 will be decided on 04/14/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231039274] | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by COSTELLO, KEVIN, MICHAEL of COSTELLO & MAINS LLC on behalf of JEROME B NAZARENO against BARTON'S WEST END FARMS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 6-10 *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.