Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Peter N Fish, against Donna Valente, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NJ, . Warren County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert A Ballard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A Ballard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by FISH, PETER, N of ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DONNA VALENTE | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DONNA VALENTE | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by FISH, PETER, N of ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DONNA VALENTE | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by FISH, PETER, N of ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DONNA VALENTE | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for WRN-L-000137-22 submitted by FISH, PETER N, ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DONNA VALENTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.