Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Diane Goodwin, Shenick Goodwin, filed a(n) Um Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) case represented by Michael Scot Raff, against Abc Corp. 1-5, John Doe 1-5, State Farm Indemnityco, represented by Charles Michael Fisher, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Adam E Jacobs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam E Jacobs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryUm Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by FISHER, CHARLES, MICHAEL of BEVELOCK & FISHER LLC on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCO against DIANE GOODWIN, SHENICK GOODWIN | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: ADAM E JACOBS |
||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by FISHER, CHARLES, MICHAEL of BEVELOCK & FISHER LLC on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCO against DIANE GOODWIN, SHENICK GOODWIN *LINKED FILING* | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/09/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231378237] | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/26/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231378237] | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by FISHER, CHARLES, MICHAEL of BEVELOCK & FISHER LLC on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCO against DIANE GOODWIN, SHENICK GOODWIN *LINKED FILING* | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20223865764] | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by FISHER, CHARLES, MICHAEL of BEVELOCK & FISHER LLC on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCO against DIANE GOODWIN, SHENICK GOODWIN | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by FISHER, CHARLES, MICHAEL of BEVELOCK & FISHER LLC on behalf of STATE FARM INDEMNITYCO against DIANE GOODWIN, SHENICK GOODWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.