Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nilima Patel, filed a(n) Um Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) case represented by Amy L Peterson, against 10 Abc Corporations 1 -, John Does "A" - "D", New Jersey Manufacturers Insur, represented by Allison Michele Kane, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Adam E Jacobs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam E Jacobs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryUm Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by KANE, ALLISON, MICHELE of KENNEDYS CMK LLP on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSUR against NILIMA PATEL, ABC CORPORATIONS 1 -10, JOHN DOES "A" - "D" | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: BRUNO MONGIARDO |
||
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by KANE, ALLISON, MICHELE of KENNEDYS CMK LLP on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSUR against NILIMA PATEL, ABC CORPORATIONS 1 -10, JOHN DOES "A" - "D" *LINKED FILING* | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by PETERSON, AMY, L of AMY L. PETERSON, PC on behalf of NILIMA PATEL against NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSUR *LINKED FILING* | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/16/2023 re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023465572] | |
March 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: BRUNO MONGIARDO |
||
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/06/2023 was rescheduled to 03/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023465572] | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by PETERSON, AMY, L of AMY L. PETERSON, PC on behalf of NILIMA PATEL against NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSUR *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.