Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mark Gencarelli, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Daniel S Suh, Sheri A Breen, against 0 Abc Manufacturer 1-1, Abc Corp 1-10, Alliance Outdoor Products Inc., Def Seller 1-10, Stokes Forest Sportshop, (total of 5) See All represented by Vanessa Marie Kelly, Yolanda Leigh Ayala, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruno Mongiardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruno Mongiardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by COHEN, ROZALY of GALLO VITUCCI & KLAR LLP on behalf of STOKES FOREST SPORT SHOP against MARK GENCARELLI | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY submitted by KELLY, VANESSA, MARIE of CLARK HILL PLC on behalf of ALLIANCE OUTDOOR PRODUCTS INC. against MARK GENCARELLI | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by SUH, DANIEL, S of ROSEMARIE ARNOLD LLP on behalf of MARK GENCARELLI against ALLIANCE OUTDOOR PRODUCTS INC., STOKES FOREST SPORT SHOP, ABC CORP 1-10, DEF CORP 1-10, ABC MANUFACTURER 1-10 ET AL. | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE-Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2023447356] | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE-Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2023449849] | |
March 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Judge: THOMAS F BROGAN |
||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/03/2023 will be decided on 03/03/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2023449849] | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/03/2023 will be decided on 03/03/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2023447356] | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by SUH, DANIEL, S of ROSEMARIE ARNOLD LLP on behalf of MARK GENCARELLI against ALLIANCE OUTDOOR PRODUCTS INC., STOKES FOREST SPORT SHOP, ABC CORP 1-10, DEF CORP 1-10, ABC MANUFACTURER 1-10 ET AL. | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by SUH, DANIEL, S of ROSEMARIE ARNOLD LLP on behalf of MARK GENCARELLI against ALLIANCE OUTDOOR PRODUCTS INC., STOKES FOREST SPORT SHOP, ABC CORP 1-10, DEF CORP 1-10, ABC MANUFACTURER 1-10 ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.