Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cure Auto Insurancecompany, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Paul Steven Kennedy, against Tatisha West, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruno Mongiardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruno Mongiardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL, STEVEN of KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of CURE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY against TATISHA WEST | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: TATISHA WEST | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service submitted by Staff | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for PAS-L-002371-22 submitted by KENNEDY, PAUL STEVEN, KENNEDY LAW FIRM on behalf of CURE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY against TATISHA WEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.