Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cleveland Boyd Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nicholas Barone, against John Does 1-10, Nicholas J Giardina, represented by Debra Ann Goldstein, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Thomas J Laconte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J Laconte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by GOLDSTEIN, DEBRA, ANN of LAW OFFICE OF LESLIE A. DETORRES on behalf of NICHOLAS J GIARDINA against CLEVELAND BOYD III | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by GOLDSTEIN, DEBRA, ANN of LAW OFFICE OF LESLIE A. DETORRES on behalf of NICHOLAS J GIARDINA against CLEVELAND BOYD III | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by CELESTINO, KATE, N of LAW OFFICE OF LESLIE A. DETORRES on behalf of NICHOLAS J GIARDINA against CLEVELAND BOYD III, JOHN DOES 1-10 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BARONE, NICHOLAS of PETER N. DAVIS & ASSOCIATES on behalf of CLEVELAND BOYD III against NICHOLAS J GIARDINA | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002361-22 submitted by BARONE, NICHOLAS , PETER N. DAVIS & ASSOCIATES on behalf of CLEVELAND BOYD III against NICHOLAS J GIARDINA, JOHN DOES 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.