Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Angelina Rodriguez, Esther Montes, Rosa Vazquez-Pagan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David Allan Di Brigida, Richard A Greifinger, against Assmaa Elsaadi Sami, Doe Corporation, John Doe, Mary Does, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Thomas J Laconte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J Laconte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by GIANNELLA, ALFRED of RICHARD A. GREIFINGER on behalf of ESTHER MONTES, ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ against ASSMAA ELSAADI SAMI, JOHN DOE, MARY DOES, DOE CORPORATION | |
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by GIANNELLA, ALFRED of RICHARD A. GREIFINGER on behalf of ESTHER MONTES, ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ against ASSMAA ELSAADI SAMI, JOHN DOE, MARY DOES, DOE CORPORATION | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002355-22 submitted by DI BRIGIDA, DAVID ALLAN, DAVID A. DI BRIGIDA on behalf of ROSA VAZQUEZ-PAGAN, ESTHER MONTES, ANGELINA RODRIGUEZ against ASSMAA ELSAADI SAMI, JOHN DOE, MARY DOES, DOE CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.