Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Julia Goykhman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bilal Adel Jaloudi, Hala Ali Jaloudi, against Abc Corps. 1-10, Erick Zienkiewicz, John Does 1-10, represented by Sean David Cascio, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVicki A Citrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ERICK ZIENKIEWICZ against JULIA GOYKHMAN | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 14, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: DARREN J DELSARDO |
||
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by JALOUDI, HALA, ALI of JALOUDI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of JULIA GOYKHMAN against ERICK ZIENKIEWICZ, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 04/05/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231019972] | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ERICK ZIENKIEWICZ against JULIA GOYKHMAN *LINKED FILING* | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/23/2023 will be decided on 04/14/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231019972] | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ERICK ZIENKIEWICZ against JULIA GOYKHMAN *LINKED FILING* | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ERICK ZIENKIEWICZ against JULIA GOYKHMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.