Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yaniris Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Steven Todd Goldstein, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, John Jane Does 1-10, Tamika A James, represented by Joseph W Lennon, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Darren J Delsardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDarren J Delsardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by LENNON, JOSEPH, W of STATE FARM on behalf of TAMIKA A JAMES against YANIRIS TORRES, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by LENNON, JOSEPH, W of STATE FARM on behalf of TAMIKA A JAMES against YANIRIS TORRES, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by GOLDSTEIN, STEVEN, TODD of GOLDSTEIN & HANDWERKER LLP on behalf of YANIRIS TORRES against TAMIKA A JAMES | |
September 17, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002332-22 submitted by GOLDSTEIN, STEVEN TODD, GOLDSTEIN & HANDWERKER LLP on behalf of YANIRIS TORRES against TAMIKA AN JAMES, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.