Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tanisha Turner, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by David S Silverman, against City Of Passaic, John Does 1-20, Passaic Affordable Housing, Passaic Housing Authority, Rental Assistance Demonstrati, (total of 6) See All represented by Kerri A Wright, Peter Joseph King, Peter Paul Perla, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVicki A Citrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 07, 2023Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F
Date: April 20, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023Letter Memorandum submitted by Court
Date: January 28, 2023CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV2023830687]
Date: March 23, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KING, PETER, JOSEPH of KING, MOENCH & COLLINS, LLP on behalf of PASSAIC HOUSING AUTHORITY against TANISHA TURNER, PASSAIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by GIARDINA, BRIAN of PORZIO BROMBERG & NEWMAN PC on behalf of PASSAIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION against TANISHA TURNER | |
May 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: VICKI A CITRINO |
||
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/12/2023 re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231258725] | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by KING, PETER, JOSEPH of KING, MOENCH & COLLINS, LLP on behalf of PASSAIC HOUSING AUTHORITY against TANISHA TURNER, CITY OF PASSAIC, PASSAIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by WRIGHT, KERRI, A of PORZIO BROMBERG & NEWMAN PC on behalf of PASSAIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION against TANISHA TURNER | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/12/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231258725] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.