Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward J Then-Toribio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David S Silverman, against John Does 1-20, Wilson J Cano, represented by Erica Tiffany Parkes, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVicki A Citrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20224132801]
Date: December 15, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge BROGAN, THOMAS, F re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20224132801] | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by PARKES, ERICA, TIFFANY of LAW OFFICE OF LESLIE A. DETORRES on behalf of WILSON J CANO against EDWARD J THEN-TORIBIO | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by PARKES, ERICA, TIFFANY of LAW OFFICE OF LESLIE A. DETORRES on behalf of WILSON J CANO against EDWARD J THEN-TORIBIO | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by SILVERMAN, DAVID, S of SILVERMAN AND ROEDEL LLC on behalf of EDWARD J THEN-TORIBIO against WILSON J CANO, JOHN DOES 1-20 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002315-22 submitted by SILVERMAN, DAVID S, SILVERMAN AND ROEDEL LLC on behalf of EDWARD J THEN-TORIBIO against WILSON J CANO, JOHN DOES 1-20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.