Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Royal Management Logistics, Ll, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mitchell J Malzberg, against Acf Organics, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Vicki A Citrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVicki A Citrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution - J submitted by Court | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: WRIT OF EXECUTION - J [LCV20231528288] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION - J submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of ROYAL MANAGEMENT LOGISTICS, LLC against ACF ORGANICS, LLC | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J [LCV20231349343] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. J 053240 23 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of ROYAL MANAGEMENT LOGISTICS, LLC against ACF ORGANICS, LLC | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment By Default uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by MITCHELL J MALZBERG | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of ROYAL MANAGEMENT LOGISTICS, LLC against ACF ORGANICS, LLC | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: ACF ORGANICS, LLC | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of ROYAL MANAGEMENT LOGISTICS, LLC against ACF ORGANICS, LLC | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of ROYAL MANAGEMENT LOGISTICS, LLC against ACF ORGANICS, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.