Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Florindo Caraballo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Glenn Z Poosikian, against Aaa Insurance - Csaainsurance, Abc Co., Anthony Corral, ) John Doe (Fictitious, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Ernest M Caposela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErnest M Caposela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by HUGHES, CHRISTOPHER, T of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ANTHONY CORRAL against FLORINDO CARABALLO | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by FLORES, EDWIN of FLORES STERNICK POOSIKIAN, LLC on behalf of FLORINDO CARABALLO against ANTHONY CORRAL | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for PAS-L-002300-22 submitted by FLORES, EDWIN , FLORES STERNICK POOSIKIAN, LLC on behalf of FLORINDO CARABALLO against ANTHONY CORRAL, JOHN DOE (FICTITIOUS), ABC CO. (FICTITIOUS), AAA INSURANCE - CSAA INSURANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.