Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Oscar J Mejia, Rosa A Mejia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nicholas Barone, against Abc Inc. 1-10, John Doe, John Does 1-10, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Xyz Co. 1-10, (total of 5) See All represented by Gilbert Samuel Hoffman, Jenna M Gough, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Adam E Jacobs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam E Jacobs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022ORDER TO BAR-Granted by Judge JACOBS, ADAM, E re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20231440003]
Date: June 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 |
AUTO ARBITRATION
Judge: THE ARBITRATOR |
||
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by GOUGH, JENNA, M of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. against ROSA A MEJIA, OSCAR J MEJIA, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC INC. 1-10 ET AL. | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY [LCV20232814390] -YOUR CASE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR REMOTE ARBITRATION ON 09/21/23 THE ARBITRATOR ASSIGNED TO YOUR CASE IS: Jodi DeMarco PLEASE SUBMIT YOUR DIRECT CONTACT INFO (PHONE NUMBER) ALONG WITH YOUR STATEMENT OF FACTS TO Email: jldmlawoffice@gmail | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Auto Arbitration" Proceeding for PAS-L-002291-22 has been scheduled for 09/21/2023. | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO BAR-Granted by Judge JACOBS, ADAM, E re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20231440003] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO BAR
Judge: ADAM E JACOBS |
||
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO BAR
Judge: ADAM E JACOBS |
||
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/03/2023 was rescheduled to 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20231440003] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.