Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Budget Rent A Car System, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by George Panteris, against Michael Arasim, in the jurisdiction of Passaic County, NJ, . Passaic County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruno Mongiardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruno Mongiardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPassaic County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SR38/SR39 submitted by PANTERIS, GEORGE of PANTERIS & PANTERIS, LLP on behalf of BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. against MICHAEL ARASIM | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment By Default uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by GEORGE PANTERIS | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT submitted by PANTERIS, GEORGE of PANTERIS & PANTERIS, LLP on behalf of BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. against MICHAEL ARASIM | |
April 15, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by PANTERIS, GEORGE of PANTERIS & PANTERIS, LLP on behalf of BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. against MICHAEL ARASIM | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: MICHAEL ARASIM | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PANTERIS, GEORGE of PANTERIS & PANTERIS, LLP on behalf of BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. against MICHAEL ARASIM | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for PAS-L-002289-22 submitted by PANTERIS, GEORGE , PANTERIS & PANTERIS, LLP on behalf of BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. against MICHAEL ARASIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.