Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christoph Gehrsitz, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Neil David Honschke, against Abc Corporation, Jim Lender, John Does 1-10, represented by Robert J Ritacco, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Valter H Must presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValter H Must Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by RITACCO, ROBERT, J of LEYDEN CAPOTORTO RITACCO CORRIGAN & SHEEHY on behalf of JIM LENDER against CHRISTOPH GEHRSITZ, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATION | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HONSCHKE, NEIL, DAVID of SILVI FEDELE & HONSCHKE, LLC on behalf of CHRISTOPH GEHRSITZ against JIM LENDER | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for OCN-L-002103-22 submitted by HONSCHKE, NEIL DAVID, SILVI FEDELE & HONSCHKE, LLC on behalf of CHRISTOPH GEHRSITZ against JIM LENDER, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.