Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael John Hoefs, against Devorah Anisfeld, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with James Den Uyl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Den Uyl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
This complaint is filed by American Express National Bank against the defendant, Devorah Anisfeld. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant was the holder of American Express credit cards and failed to make payments on the accounts. The plaintiff cla...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 22, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DEVORAH ANISFELD | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by HOEFS, MICHAEL, JOHN of DOYLE & HOEFS, LLC on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DEVORAH ANISFELD | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by HOEFS, MICHAEL, JOHN of DOYLE & HOEFS, LLC on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DEVORAH ANISFELD | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for OCN-L-002096-22 submitted by HOEFS, MICHAEL JOHN, DOYLE & HOEFS, LLC on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against DEVORAH ANISFELD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.