Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Linda Raffone, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Marisa F Dominguez, against Abc Xyz Company, Dan-D, Inc., John Doe 1-10, Shoprite, represented by Peter R Errico, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with James Den Uyl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Den Uyl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge DEN UYL, JAMES re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231851609] | |
July 21, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES DEN UYL |
||
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by DOMINGUEZ, MARISA, F of RICCI & FAVA, LLC on behalf of LINDA RAFFONE against SHOPRITE, DAN-D, INC., JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC/XYZ COMPANY | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES DEN UYL |
||
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/21/2023 was rescheduled to 07/21/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231851609] | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by ERRICO, PETER, R of WOLFF HELIES SPAETH & LUCAS, PA on behalf of SHOPRITE against LINDA RAFFONE, DAN-D, INC., JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC/XYZ COMPANY *LINKED FILING* | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by ERRICO, PETER, R of WOLFF HELIES SPAETH & LUCAS, PA on behalf of SHOPRITE against LINDA RAFFONE *LINKED FILING* | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/21/2023 will be decided on 07/07/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231851609] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.