Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Patricia Stansbury, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Steven B Dimian, against Abc Corporations 1-5, Andrew Cirlincione, Drew Electric, Gianna Souders, John Does 1-5, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with James Den Uyl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Den Uyl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
This complaint is filed by Patricia Stansbury against defendants Steven Gray, Gianna Souders, Andrew Cirlincione, Drew Electric, John Does 1-5, and ABC Corporations 1-5. The complaint alleges that on or about October 1, 2020, Patricia Stansbury was d...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by DIMIAN, STEVEN, B of DIMIAN & MASTERPALO LLC on behalf of PATRICIA STANSBURY against STEVEN GRAY, GIANNA SOUDERS, ANDREW CIRLINCIONE, DREW ELECTRIC, JOHN DOES 1-5 ET AL. | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by DIMIAN, STEVEN, B of DIMIAN & MASTERPALO LLC on behalf of PATRICIA STANSBURY against STEVEN GRAY, GIANNA SOUDERS, ANDREW CIRLINCIONE, DREW ELECTRIC, JOHN DOES 1-5 ET AL. | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for OCN-L-002082-22 submitted by DIMIAN, STEVEN B, DIMIAN & MASTERPALO LLC on behalf of PATRICIA STANSBURY against STEVEN GRAY, GIANNA SOUDERS, ANDREW CIRLINCIONE, DREW ELECTRIC, JOHN DOES 1-5 ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.