Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alina Dzialowski, filed a(n) Tenancy case represented by Jena R Silverman, against Adriene Amewudah, represented by Fayyaz Ahmed, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with James Den Uyl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Den Uyl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryTenancy |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by SILVERMAN, JENA, R of SILVERMAN & STEEN, ATTORNEYS AT LAW on behalf of ALINA DZIALOWSKI against ADRIENE AMEWUDAH | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by AHMED, FAYYAZ of IBRAHIM AHMED LAW GROUP, PC on behalf of ADRIENE AMEWUDAH against ALINA DZIALOWSKI | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by AHMED, FAYYAZ of IBRAHIM AHMED LAW GROUP, PC on behalf of ADRIENE AMEWUDAH against ALINA DZIALOWSKI | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by SILVERMAN, JENA, R of SILVERMAN & STEEN, ATTORNEYS AT LAW on behalf of ALINA DZIALOWSKI against ADRIENE AMEWUDAH | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for OCN-L-002081-22 submitted by SILVERMAN, JENA R, SILVERMAN & STEEN, ATTORNEYS AT LAW on behalf of ALINA DZIALOWSKI against ADRIENE AMEWUDAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.