Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jorge Cortes, Laurie Suchodolski, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian William Kincaid, against Lisa M Crothers, represented by Michael Bruce Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Valter H Must presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValter H Must Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeReinstated |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 31, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 29, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 20, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by MILLER, ERIC, M of KELLY & MILLER LLC on behalf of LISA M CROTHERS against LAURIE SUCHODOLSKI | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by KELLY, MICHAEL, BRUCE of KELLY & MILLER LLC on behalf of LISA M CROTHERS against LAURIE SUCHODOLSKI | |
May 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REINSTATE CASE-Granted by Judge MUST, VALTER, H re: MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE [LCV2023679628] | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE
Judge: VALTER H MUST |
||
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/23/2023 will be decided on 03/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE [LCV2023679628] | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE submitted by KINCAID, BRIAN, WILLIAM of FEIN SUCH KAHN & SHEPARD PC on behalf of LAURIE SUCHODOLSKI, JORGE CORTES against LISA M CROTHERS | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge MUST, VALTER, H re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20224453665] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.