Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Township Of Toms River, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Paul R Rizzo, against Financial Services Bureau Ofh, Garden State Veterinary Specia, Joseph Curcio, Jr., Joseph M Lepree, Karen Curcio, (total of 13) See All represented by Lawrence H Shapiro, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Francis Hodgson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis Hodgson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Order Show Cause(Setting Hearing Date)-GRANTED by Judge Marlene Lynch Ford, A.J.S.C.
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by ASHNAULT, BRIAN, JOSEPH of ANSELL GRIMM & AARON PC on behalf of JOSEPH CURCIO, JR., KAREN CURCIO against TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER, FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP ET AL. | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time For Filing Of Document - GRANTED by Judge HODGSON, FRANCIS | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by RIZZO, PAUL, R of DI FRANCESCO BATEMAN on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER against FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP, JOSEPH CURCIO, JR. ET AL. | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO WITHDRAW FUNDS-Granted by Judge HODGSON, FRANCIS re: MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS [LCV2023683085] | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS
Judge: FRANCIS HODGSON |
||
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SHAPIRO, LAWRENCE, H of ANSELL GRIMM & AARON PC on behalf of JOSEPH CURCIO, JR., KAREN CURCIO against TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER, FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP ET AL. | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by RIZZO, PAUL, R of DI FRANCESCO BATEMAN on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER against FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP, JOSEPH CURCIO, JR. ET AL. | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/23/2023 will be decided on 03/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS [LCV2023683085] | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS submitted by ASHNAULT, BRIAN, JOSEPH of ANSELL GRIMM & AARON PC on behalf of JOSEPH CURCIO, JR., KAREN CURCIO against TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER, FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP ET AL. | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by RIZZO, PAUL, R of DI FRANCESCO BATEMAN on behalf of TOWNSHIP OF TOMS RIVER against FINANCIAL SERVICES BUREAU OF H, SLOMINS, INC., STATE OF NEW JERSEY, POINT PLEASANT RADIOLOGY GROUP, JOSEPH CURCIO, JR. ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.