Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lori Carr, filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Christopher A De Angelo, against Abc Corporations 1-5, Alanric Food Distributors, Inc, John Does 1-5, Mulberry Street, Orations 1 Xyz Distributor Corp, (total of 7) See All represented by Ada Sachter Gallicchio, Gregory J Guido, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Robert E Brenner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert E Brenner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Lori Carr against Alanric Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Ferrara Foods and Cento Fine Foods, Mulberry Street, and other defendants. The complaint alleges that Lori Carr purchased a Ferrara Torrone Soft Almon...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: ROBERT E BRENNER |
||
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ALANRIC FOOD DISTRIBUTORS, INC, MULBERRY STREET against LORI CARR *LINKED FILING* | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/24/2023 re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231605161] | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ALANRIC FOOD DISTRIBUTORS, INC, MULBERRY STREET against LORI CARR *LINKED FILING* | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by CASCIO, SEAN, DAVID of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ALANRIC FOOD DISTRIBUTORS, INC, MULBERRY STREET against LORI CARR | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DEFICIENCY CORRECTION [LCV20231605170] -For future motion related filings: Please link the filing to the relevant motion. The filings can be submitted under "Motion Response", select the needed document type, and link the filing to the relevant motion. Thank you. | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/23/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231605161] | |
March 31, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: ROBERT E BRENNER |
||
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by GALLICCHIO, ADA, SACHTER of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of ALANRIC FOOD DISTRIBUTORS, INC, MULBERRY STREET against LORI CARR *LINKED FILING* | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/30/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023722958] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.