Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Park Bank, filed a(n) Summary Action case represented by Jenifer Gaglia Fowler, against Tammy Hughes, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategorySummary Action |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeCompleted-Other Summary Proceeding |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JENIFER GAGLIA FOWLER | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by FOWLER, JENIFER, GAGLIA of EISNER & FOWLER on behalf of PARK BANK against TAMMY HUGHES, SOLE HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA STUART | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY submitted by HANRATTY, EDWARD, GEORGE of EDWARD HANRATTY on behalf of TAMMY HUGHES, SOLE HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA STUART against PARK BANK | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: WRIT OF REPLEVIN [LCV20223975669] -The original was mailed on 11/17/22. Thank you. | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Of Replevin - GRANTED by Judge WELLERSON, CRAIG, L | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Of Replevin - GRANTED by Judge WELLERSON, CRAIG, L | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order To Vacate Order - GRANTED by Judge WELLERSON, CRAIG, L | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition To Motion uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by TAMMY HUGHES, SOLE HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF CYNTHIA STUART | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SHOW CAUSE-Denied by Judge WELLERSON, CRAIG, L re: Verified Complaint [LCV20223313898] | |
October 21, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.