Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mariusz Ruszala, Mary Ruszala, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Daniel Barli, against John Doe 1-50, Kenneth Formica, Kpf88 Llc, Xyz Companies 1-50, represented by Stasha M Sosnowicz, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryComplex Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by BARLI, DANIEL of BARLI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA against KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA, JOHN DOE 1-50, XYZ COMPANIES 1-50 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by SOSNOWICZ, STASHA, M of COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN PC on behalf of KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA against MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA | |
December 16, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
||
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 12/16/2022 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20223884782] | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BARLI, DANIEL of BARLI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA against KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA, JOHN DOE 1-50, XYZ COMPANIES 1-50 *LINKED FILING* | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DEFICIENCY CORRECTION [LCV20224200688] -This is a motion related document. All motion related documents need to be submitted under "motion response" choose document type & link it to the motion. Thank you. | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by BARLI, DANIEL of BARLI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA against KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA, JOHN DOE 1-50, XYZ COMPANIES 1-50 | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by BARLI, DANIEL of BARLI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA against KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA, JOHN DOE 1-50, XYZ COMPANIES 1-50 *LINKED FILING* | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SOSNOWICZ, STASHA, M of COHEN SEGLIAS PALLAS GREENHALL & FURMAN PC on behalf of KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA against MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA *LINKED FILING* | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BARLI, DANIEL of BARLI & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of MARIUSZ RUSZALA, MARY RUSZALA against KPF88 LLC, KENNETH FORMICA, JOHN DOE 1-50, XYZ COMPANIES 1-50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.