Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Leon Sarvis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kevin N Starkey, against Eliezer Y Rosenberg, Jane John Doe, represented by Jamie L Barron, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by BAIDON-CIOBANU, SUZANNE, K of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG against LEON SARVIS | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by BAIDON-CIOBANU, SUZANNE, K of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG against LEON SARVIS | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by JAFFE, JOSHUA, DANIEL of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG against LEON SARVIS | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY submitted by JAFFE, JOSHUA, DANIEL of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG against LEON SARVIS | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by BARRON, JAMIE, L of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on behalf of ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG against LEON SARVIS, JANE/JOHN DOE | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for OCN-L-002023-22 submitted by STARKEY, KEVIN N, STARKEY KELLY KENNEALLY CUNNINGHAM & TURNBACH on behalf of LEON SARVIS against ELIEZER Y ROSENBERG, JANE/JOHN DOE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.