Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbara Bauman, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Michael Joseph Hanus, against Lacey Mall, Pasbjerg Managementco. Inc., Pf Pasbjerg Llc, Piedmont Associatesllc, represented by Michael J Notartomas, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Craig L Wellerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig L Wellerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Barbara Bauman against defendants Lacey Mall, Piedmont Associates LLC, PF Pasbjerg LLC, Pasbjerg Management Co. Inc., John Does 1-30, and ABC Corps 1-30. The complaint alleges that on or about March 29, 2021, Barbara Bauman...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 15, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 22, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 18, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT & RESTORE
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
||
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 07/24/2023 re: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT & RESTORE [LCV20232127530] | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by NOTARTOMAS, MICHAEL, J of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of PIEDMONT ASSOCIATESLLC against BARBARA BAUMAN | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by NOTARTOMAS, MICHAEL, J of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of PIEDMONT ASSOCIATESLLC, PF PASBJERG LLC, PASBJERG MANAGEMENT CO. INC. against BARBARA BAUMAN *LINKED FILING* | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: Answer w/CrossClaim [LCV20232147459] -Please resubmit your consent order as a consent order. Thank you. | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT & RESTORE submitted by NOTARTOMAS, MICHAEL, J of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of PIEDMONT ASSOCIATESLLC, PF PASBJERG LLC, PASBJERG MANAGEMENT CO. INC. against BARBARA BAUMAN *LINKED FILING* | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/19/2023 will be decided on 08/04/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT & RESTORE [LCV20232127530] | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: CRAIG L WELLERSON |
||
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by NOTARTOMAS, MICHAEL, J of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of PASBJERG MANAGEMENT CO. INC. against BARBARA BAUMAN *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.